EP1139281 - IC card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem Orga GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Sagem Orga GmbH Am Hoppenhof 33 33104 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Orga Kartensysteme GmbH Am Hoppenhof 33 33104 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juilfs, Adolf Hamburger Chaussee 25 24220 Flintbek / DE | [2001/40] | Application number, filing date | 01102951.9 | 08.02.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | DE2000116283 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10016283 | [2001/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139281 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1139281 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/08, G07F7/10 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G06K19/07739 (EP);
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07726 (EP);
G06K19/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | G06K19/077, G06K19/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/40] | Title | German: | Datenträgerkarte | [2001/40] | English: | IC card | [2001/40] | French: | Carte à puce | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2669169 (MEZIANE ABDELLAH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9636009 (NAT WESTMINSTER BANK PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 18 *; | [A]US5577109 (STIMSON CHARLES J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0887767 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2780679 (ONGOUYA JEAN FELIX [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 13 * * figures 1,2 * |