14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
21.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
15.04.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
25.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |
24.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
23.04.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
02.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.02.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.11.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.10.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.07.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.07.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.03.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
04.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.02.2003 |
First examination report |
|
13.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.07.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
05.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
29.11.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
28.11.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|