EP1232794 - Method for separating of a multi-phase mixture and decanter centrifuge system for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westfalia Separator AG Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2003/38] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Westfalia Separator Industry GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleuter, Markus Schmalbrockskamp 9 59320 Ennigerloh / DE | 02 /
Brinkmann, Andreas Kaiserforst 37 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 01102962.6 | 08.02.2001 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232794 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232794 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/20 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B04B1/2016 (EP,US);
B04B1/20 (EP,US);
B04B2001/2041 (EP,US);
B04B2001/2083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trennen eines Mehrphasengemisches und Dekantierzentrifungensystem zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2002/34] | English: | Method for separating of a multi-phase mixture and decanter centrifuge system for carrying out this method | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation d'un mélange à phases multiples et système de centrifugeuse décanteuse pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 17.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2003 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.06.2004 | IE | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | TR | 09.06.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | ES | 20.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | AT | 08.02.2005 | CY | 08.02.2005 | LU | 08.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 08.02.2005 | ||
CY | 08.02.2005 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 08.02.2005 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 08.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 08.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 09.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1951574 (BIRD MACHINE CO) [A] 1,17 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4303192 (KATSUME HIDE) [A] 1,17* column A; figure - *; | [YA]DE4320265 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [Y] 19 * abstract * [A] 2; | [YA]DE19500600 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [Y] 20 * column A; figure - * [A] 8; | [XAY]WO9720634 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 17,18 * figures 2,3,7,10,22; claims 12-14,18; table 1 * [A] 1 [Y] 19,20 |