EP1126088 - Hydraulic system for the dampening of inertia load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gitter, Richard John 10632 Cardianl Drive Peosta, IA 52068 / US | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Lau-Loskill, Philipp Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Lau-Loskill, Philipp, Dipl.-Phys. Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103212.5 | 12.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | US20000507350 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: US 507350 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126088 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126088 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1126088 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22, E02F9/12 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
E02F9/226 (EP,US);
E02F9/2207 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/17] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulische Anordnung zur Dämpfung der Trägheitskraft | [2001/34] | English: | Hydraulic system for the dampening of inertia load | [2001/34] | French: | Système hydraulique amortisseur de charge inertielle | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5159813 (YOSHIMATSU HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 10, line 19 - line 34; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7-14; | [Y]US5513551 (MORISHITA YUTARO [JP]) [Y] 7-14 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9745659 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6; | [XP]US6112521 (HAYASHI SEITA [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,6* column 14, line 30 - column 18, line 10; figure 7 * |