EP1172801 - Acoustic lens and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/03] | Ultrasonic probe and method of manufacturing the same | ||
[2008/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Koetsu 4-8-1, Higashinakano, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0003 / JP | 02 /
Fukase, Hirokazu 3-4-29, Minamikase, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0055 / JP | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/03] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103277.8 | 13.02.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | JP20000212453 | 13.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000212453 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1172801 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1172801 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172801 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/30 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
G10K11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/43] |
Former [2002/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Akustische Linse und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2008/44] | English: | Acoustic lens and method of manufacturing the same | [2008/44] | French: | Lentille acoustique et procédé de sa fabrication | [2008/44] |
Former [2002/03] | Ultraschallwandler und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2002/03] | Ultrasonic probe and method of manufacturing the same | ||
Former [2002/03] | Sonde à ultrasons et son procédé de production | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6211897 ; | [A]US4651850 (MATSUO KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-5,11,13,14 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 33 *; | [A]US5626138 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 5, line 56 - line 58 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 08, Database accession no. 1987-054675, XP002263621 & JPS6211897 A 19870120 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |