EP1125743 - Liquid discharging head, liquid discharging apparatus, and method of producing the same head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Masahiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takenouchi, Masanori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kudo, Kiyomitsu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Ryoji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/34] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103446.9 | 14.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | JP20000037188 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000037188 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1125743 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125743 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/055 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B41J2/14048 (EP,US);
B41J2/14112 (EP,US);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/1604 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1639 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Flüssigkeitsausstossgerät | [2001/34] | English: | Liquid discharging head, liquid discharging apparatus, and method of producing the same head | [2001/34] | French: | Tête d'éjection de liquide, appareil d'éjection de liquide et sa méthode de fabication | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2007 | BE | 17.01.2007 | CH | 17.01.2007 | CY | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | FI | 17.01.2007 | FR | 17.01.2007 | IT | 17.01.2007 | LI | 17.01.2007 | NL | 17.01.2007 | TR | 17.01.2007 | IE | 14.02.2007 | LU | 14.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | SE | 17.04.2007 | GR | 18.04.2007 | ES | 28.04.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
FR | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
LU | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
FR | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
FR | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
FR | 07.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 17.01.2007 | |
PT | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63199972 ; | [A]JPH02113950 ; | [A]EP0436047 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0811491 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 33, line 40 - column 39, line 45 * * figures 23-26 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881214), vol. 012, no. 478, Database accession no. (M - 775), & JP63199972 A 19880818 (CANON INC) [A] 1,4,7,11,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900717), vol. 014, no. 331, Database accession no. (M - 0999), & JP02113950 A 19900426 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,4,7,11,14,15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4723129 | EP0436047 |