EP1103469 - Apparatus for severing and coiling wire wrapped around a bale [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enterprises International, Inc. P.O. Box 293 Hoquiam Washington 98550-0358 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Enterprises International, Inc. P.O. Box 293 Hoquiam Washington 98550-0358 / US | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states LAMB-GRAYS HARBOR CO. Blaine and Firman Streets, P.O. Box 359 Hoquiam, Washington 98550-0359 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merrill, Stanley R. 222 Ocean Beach Road Hoquiam, Washington 98550 / US | 02 /
Hawley, Michael E. 525 Westhill Avenue Beaconsfield, Quebec H9W 2G5 / CA | 03 /
Dalietos, Paul 2827 Windsor Lane S.W. Tumwater, Washington 98512 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103461.8 | 21.10.1998 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | US19970962226 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: US 962226 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103469 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
B65B69/0025 (EP,US);
Y10S83/909 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49821 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5139 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trennen und Aufwickeln eines einen Ballen umgreifenden Drahtes | [2003/14] | English: | Apparatus for severing and coiling wire wrapped around a bale | [2001/22] | French: | Appareil pour détacher et embobiner un fil encerclant une balle | [2001/22] |
Former [2001/22] | Vorrichtung zum trennen und aufwickeln eines Ballen umreifenden drahtes | Examination procedure | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98953789.9 / EP0950008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2001 | 31.10.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4261395 (GRONAU KURT) [Y] 2,4,5,7-9 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 68; figure - *; | [Y]EP0281942 (B & G FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-10 * column 5, line 36 - column 8, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US4841619 (THERIAULT MARIO [CA]); | [DY]WO9213768 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE]) [DY] 1-5,7-10 * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 26; figure - *; | [A]WO9317916 (JP PROJEKTTEKNIK AB [SE]) | by applicant | WO9213768 |