EP1139410 - Method of manufacturing bump-component mounted body and device for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukamoto, Masahide 30-14, Tomioizumigaoka Nara-shi, Nara 631-0051 / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/40] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103502.9 | 15.02.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000040618 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000040618 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139410 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1139410 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56, H01L21/60 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H05K3/30 (KR);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H05K3/284 (EP,US);
H05K3/303 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1134 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75315 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7598 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81209 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83101 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83102 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92125 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19043 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0278 (EP,US);
H05K2203/085 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49144 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53174 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53178 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53183 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53191 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/13099, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92125, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13099 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/25] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Montierungsverfahren von höckerartigen Bauelementen auf einem Substrat und Vorrichtung zum Montieren derselben | [2001/40] | English: | Method of manufacturing bump-component mounted body and device for manufacturing the same | [2001/40] | French: | Méthode d'assemblage d'un composant comprenant des plots de contacts sur un substrat et dispositif d'assemblage | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07297231 ; | [X]JPH01309343 ; | [Y]US4933042 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W [US], et al) [Y] 13 * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 11; figure 3C *; | [XY]US5352629 (PAIK KYUNG W [US], et al) [X] 16-19,21,22 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 26; figure 3 * [Y] 9,20; | [XY]US5605547 (LAKE RICKIE C [US]) [X] 1-5,7,10-12,14,15 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 30; figure 4 * [Y] 8,9,13; | [XY]US5998242 (KIRKPATRICK GALEN C [US], et al) [X] 6 * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 17; figures 2,4 * [Y] 8,20 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07297231 A 19951110 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900227), vol. 014, no. 108, Database accession no. (E - 0896), & JP01309343 A 19891213 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,7 * abstract * |