EP1128398 - Resistance element and method of production of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawamura, Kentaro TDK Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103579.7 | 20.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | JP20000042642 | 21.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000042642 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128398 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128398 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/02, H01C7/00, H01C17/065, H05B3/18, H05B3/14 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H01C17/281 (EP,US);
C04B35/5626 (EP,US);
C04B35/597 (EP,US);
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
H01C1/146 (EP,US);
H01C7/008 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3865 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3869 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3878 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,US);
C04B2235/767 (EP,US);
C04B2235/79 (EP,US);
C04B2237/125 (EP,US);
C04B2237/368 (EP,US);
C04B2237/403 (EP,US);
C04B2237/405 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/408 (EP,US);
C04B2237/68 (EP,US);
C04B2237/82 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | H01C7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Widerstandselement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/35] | English: | Resistance element and method of production of same | [2001/35] | French: | Elément de résistance et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0948001 (TDK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 7,9-11; | [A]EP0763693 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 9, line 15 - line 18 *; | [A]US4810853 (MARUTA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 6, line 63 - line 69 *; | [Y]EP0748144 (TDK CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,9-11 * page 8, line 17 - line 30 * * page 9, line 58 - line 59 *; | [A]US4814581 (NUNOGAKI NAOCHIKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 12 - line 18 *; | [A]US5362944 (HATANAKA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 * |