EP1128351 - Vehicular travel control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuramochi, Yuichi Yuukou-ryo B-314, 1477-2, Tabiko Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0063 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Tatsuya 1603-64, Hirano, Urizura-machi Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-2104 / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Shinichi 117-131, Sakuragawa, Tsutsui Aomori-shi, Aomori 030-0945 / JP | 04 /
Tanimichi, Taisetsu Yuukou-ryo B-404, 1477-2, Tabiko Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0063 / JP | 05 /
Konishi, Yasufumi Yuukou-ryo B-109, 1477-2, Tabiko Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0063 / JP | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103666.2 | 23.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | JP20000051032 | 28.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000051032 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128351 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128351 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128351 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60Q1/52 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B60Q9/008 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0057 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
B60W2754/30 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2002/29] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrwegsteuersystem für ein Fahrzeug | [2001/40] | English: | Vehicular travel control system | [2001/35] | French: | Système de contrôle du déplacement d'un véhicule | [2001/35] |
Former [2001/35] | Ein Fahrwegsteuersystem für ein Fahrzeug | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5633705 (ASAYAMA YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, lines 20-70 * * column 3, lines 1-45 *; | [A]US5678650 (ISHIHARA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-7 * * column 1, lines 30-70 ** column 2, lines 10-70 *; | [A]WO9832030 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-14 * * page 6, lines 1-17 * * page 9, lines 5-15 * * page 10, lines 10-25 * * page 17, lines 20-30 * * page 18, lines 1-10 * |