EP1232769 - Capsule seed manufactured with Pd-103 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEA Technology QSA GmbH Gieselweg 1 38110 Braunschweig / DE | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Eberhard, Dr. c/o AEA Technology QSA GmbH, Gieselweg 1 38110 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Shilton, Mark, Dr. AEA Technology QSA, Amersham Lab, White Lion Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103825.4 | 15.02.2001 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232769 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
A61N5/1027 (EP);
A61N2005/1024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/20] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aus Pd-103 hergestellter Kapsel | [2002/34] | English: | Capsule seed manufactured with Pd-103 | [2002/34] | French: | Capsule fabriquée avec du Pd-103 | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9933063 (ROBERTSON ROBERT [CA]) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 15 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 6 * * page 8, line 2 - line 5 * * page 12, line 20 - line 22 * * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 28; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]WO9951299 (BIONUCLEONICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 12, line 24 - page 22, line 30; claim 1 * * page 28, line 24 - page 29, line 2 *; | [A]WO0027477 (RADIOMED CORP [US]) [A] 1,6,8,13,15 * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 30 * * page 19, line 20 - page 20, line 7 * * page 22, line 8 - line 19 * * page 25, line 16 - line 24 *; | [A]WO9939765 (IMPLANT SCIENCES CORP [US]) [A] 1,13 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 5 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 8 * * page 13, line 11 - line 13 * * page 15, line 7 - line 9 *; | [A]US5713828 (CONIGLIONE ROY [US]) [A] 1,6,7,10-13 * column 6, line 42 - line 65 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 13 * * column 10, line 24 - line 33 *; | [DA]EP1008995 (EUROTOPE ENTWICKLUNGSGESELLSCH [DE]) [DA] 1,3,13 * column 6, line 14 - line 21 *; | [DA]WO8604248 (NUCLEAR MEDICINE INC [US]) [DA] 1,4,13,14 * page 8, line 8 - line 21 * | by applicant | US3351049 | US4994013 | US5163896 | WO9719706 | EP1008995 | WO8604248 | EP1060765 | EP1060764 |