EP1133099 - Method and apparatus for symmetric-key encryption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furuya, Soichi, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Takaragi, Kazuo, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kurumatani, Hiroyuki, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Masashi, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Miyazaki, Kunihiko, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Sato, Hisayoshi, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 07 /
Watanabe, Dai, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/37] | Application number, filing date | 01103891.6 | 16.02.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP20000070994 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000070994 | JP20000210690 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000210690 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1133099 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1133099 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/06 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H04L9/0822 (EP,US);
H04L9/0625 (EP,US);
H04L9/0637 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/37] | H04L9/06, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/45] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verschlüsselung mittels symmetrischem Schlüssel | [2001/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for symmetric-key encryption | [2001/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de chiffrage à clé symmétrique | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - FURUYA S ; SAKURAI K, "Single-path authenticated-encryption scheme based on universal hashing", SELECTED AREAS IN CRYPTOGRAPHY. 9TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, SAC (SPRINGER VERLAG, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.2595)., St. John's, Nfld., Canada, (20020816), ISBN 3-540-00622-2, pages 94 - 109, XP002264289 [T] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - TAYLOR R, "AN INTEGRITY CHECK VALUE ALGORITHM FOR STREAM CIPHERS", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY (CRYPTO). SANTA BARBARA, AUG. 22 - 26, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CRYPTOLOGY CONFERENCE (CRYPTO), BERLIN, SPRINGER, DE, (19930822), vol. CONF. 13, ISBN 3-540-57766-1, pages 40 - 48, XP000502362 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [T] - JUTLA C S, "Encryption modes with almost free message integrity", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY. EUROCRYPT 2001, (20010510), pages 529 - 544, XP002214999 [T] 1-16 * page 531 - page 533; figure 1 * | by applicant | - RICHARD TAYLOR, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CRYPTOLOGY CONFERENCE, pages 40 - 48 |