EP1123812 - Article for colored printing and method for printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nohr, Ronald Sinclair 8955, Nesbit Lakes Drive Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | 02 /
MacDonald, John Gavin 1472 Knollwood Terrace Decatur, GA 30033 / US | 03 /
Lindsay, Jeffrey Dean 20 Diane Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104036.7 | 03.06.1996 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | US19950462105 | 05.06.1995 Original published format: US 462105 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1123812 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/14, B41M5/28, B41M5/40, C09D5/00, B32B27/16, B43K5/00, C08K5/00, B41M5/26, B32B27/18, C09D11/00, G01J1/50 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
B41M5/46 (EP);
B41M3/14 (EP);
B41M3/142 (EP);
B41M5/26 (EP);
B41M5/267 (EP);
B41M5/284 (EP);
B41M7/0009 (EP);
B43M11/08 (EP);
C07C65/38 (EP);
C07C69/76 (EP);
C08B37/0012 (EP);
C08B37/0015 (EP);
C09B67/0071 (EP);
C09D11/17 (EP);
C09D11/30 (EP);
C09D11/328 (EP);
C09D11/36 (EP);
C09D11/50 (EP);
C09D5/004 (EP);
G03G9/08 (EP);
G03G9/0825 (EP);
G03G9/08777 (EP);
G03G9/0906 (EP);
G03G9/0926 (EP);
G03G9/09708 (EP);
G03G9/09733 (EP);
G03G9/09741 (EP);
G03G9/0975 (EP);
G03G9/09791 (EP);
G09B3/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | Gegenstand für Farbdruck und Druckverfahren | [2001/33] | English: | Article for colored printing and method for printing | [2001/33] | French: | Article pour impression et procédé d'impression | [2001/33] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 06.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96917030.7 / EP0830256 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |