EP1170905 - Apparatus for selecting services and Internet providers for a broad band application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hnyk, Rüdiger Pfarrwiese 22 61118 Bad Vibel / DE | 02 /
Krupp, Johannes Herderstrasse 25 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | [2002/02] | Application number, filing date | 01104140.7 | 21.02.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | DE2000111527 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10011527 | [2002/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170905 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170905 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
H04L12/2898 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/31] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auswählen von Diensten und Internetprovidern für Breitbandanwendungen | [2002/02] | English: | Apparatus for selecting services and Internet providers for a broad band application | [2002/02] | French: | Dispositif pour sélectionner des services et des fournisseurs d' accès à Internet pour des applications à large bande | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/51] | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9729584 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [X]EP0812085 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 11 * * column 11, line 9 - column 12, line 43; figure 11 *; | [X]WO9935811 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * claims 1-30 * * page 1, line 24 - page 6, line 27 *; | [X] - KORPI M ET AL, "SUPPLEMENTARY SERVICES IN THE H.323 IP TELEPHONY NETWORK", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (199907), vol. 37, no. 7, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 118 - 125, XP000835313 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * Abschnitt: "Functional Entities in H.323" * * page 118 * * page 119; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.774890 |