EP1138485 - Device for secure registration mounting a printing plate on the plate cylinder of a sheet-fed printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/40] | Method and device for secure registration mounting a printing plate on the plate cylinder of a sheet-fed printing machine | ||
[2007/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2001/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jehring, Arnfried Lindenauer Strasse 11 d 01640 Coswig / DE | 02 /
Techert, Andreas Robert-Blum-Strasse 28 01640 Coswig / DE | 03 /
Zscheile, Ralf Heinrichstrasse 1 01468 Friedewald / DE | 04 /
Ziegenbalg, Christian Barthshügelstrasse 44 01689 Weinböhla / DE | [2001/40] | Application number, filing date | 01104227.2 | 22.02.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | DE2000115727 | 29.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10015727 | [2001/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138485 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138485 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138485 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/00, B41F27/12 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
B41F27/12 (EP);
B41P2227/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | B41F27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum sicheren registergerechten Aufspannen einer Druckplatte auf den Plattenzylinder einer Bogendruckmaschine | [2007/05] | English: | Device for secure registration mounting a printing plate on the plate cylinder of a sheet-fed printing machine | [2007/05] | French: | Dispositif d'accrochage en réglage du registre sécurisée d'une plaque d'impression sur le cylindre porte-plaque d'une machine à imprimer des feuilles | [2007/05] |
Former [2001/40] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum sicheren registergerechten Aufspannen einer Druckplatte auf den Plattenzylinder einer Bogendruckmaschine | ||
Former [2001/40] | Method and device for secure registration mounting a printing plate on the plate cylinder of a sheet-fed printing machine | ||
Former [2001/40] | Méthode et dispositif d'accrochage en réglage du registre sécurisee d'une plaque d'impression sur le cylindre porte-plaque d'une machine à imprimer des feuilles | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | IE | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | ES | 10.09.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | AT | 22.02.2008 | LU | 22.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | CH | 29.02.2008 | LI | 29.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/28] | CY | 30.05.2007 | |
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
AT | 22.02.2008 | ||
LU | 22.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 30.05.2007 | |
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
AT | 22.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
AT | 22.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 30.05.2007 | |
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 10.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE7728905U (REGISTER SYSTEM GMBH) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]DE3438931 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0184063 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0221322 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0581212 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29907123U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * page 2, line 4 - page 6, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0933207 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 2,10,11 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-4; claims 1-6,14,15 *; | [A]EP0982130 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |