EP1168130 - Remote monitoring diagnostic system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | For all designated states Hitachi Engineering & Services Co., Ltd. 2-2, Saiwai-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0073 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Engineering & Services Co., Ltd. 2-2, Saiwai-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 317-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Hiraku 1977-16, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Zenji 23-7, Nishinarusawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0032 / JP | 03 /
Ichihashi, Akiyo 8-13-403, Saiwai-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 317-0073 / JP | 04 /
Okabe, Akira 5-35-6, Takasuzu-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 317-0066 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/01] | Application number, filing date | 01104280.1 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000192650 | 22.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000192650 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168130 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G05B23/0264 (EP,US);
G05B23/027 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24048 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24084 (EP,US);
G05B2223/06 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Diagnostisches Fernsehüberwachungssytem und Verfahren | [2002/01] | English: | Remote monitoring diagnostic system and method | [2002/01] | French: | Système de surveillance-diagnostique à distance et procédé | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4383298 (HUFF ROBERT G, et al); | [A]US4908746 (VAUGHN MITCHELL D [US]) [A] * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5311562 (PALUSAMY SAM S [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,8 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 9 *; | [A]US5452218 (TUCKER MARVIN G [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-9 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 30 *; | [A]US5566092 (WANG HSU-PIN [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-9 * column 10, line 33 - column 12, line 4 *; | [XY]US5596712 (TSUYAMA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 5; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,5,8; | [A]US5940300 (OZAKI HIROJI [JP]) [A] 1-5,7-9 * figures 1,4-7 * | Examination | JPH0286927 | US5878566 |