EP1168782 - Caller identification method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenovis GmbH & Co. KG Kleyerstrasse 94 60362 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodewald, Frank Pützer Strasse 22 50181 Bedburg / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte, et al Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/19] |
Former [2002/01] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104392.4 | 23.02.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | DE2000130406 | 21.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030406 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168782 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168782 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/57, H04M1/56, H04M3/42, H04M1/723, H04Q7/32 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H04M1/57 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | H04M1/57 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anruferidentifikation | [2002/01] | English: | Caller identification method | [2002/01] | French: | Méthode d'identification de l'appelant | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 07.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/09] | 11.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4672660 (CURTIN WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, line 25 - line 49 *; | [X]EP0653869 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - line 22 * * page 3, line 10 - line 20 * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 9 * * page 4, line 39 - line 42 * * page 5, line 3 - line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5933785 (TAYLOE DANIEL RICHARD [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 1, line 36 - line 60 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 40 ** column 5, line 32 - line 37 *; | [X]US5983095 (CAMERON DUNCAN PETER CRAIG [GB]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 19 * * column 1, line 57 - line 62 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 32 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 64 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 33 *; | [X]WO0028722 (WOORIGISOOL INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 10 * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 4 * * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 3 * * page 14, line 16 - line 23 * * figure 3 * |