EP1132947 - Fabrication system with extensible equipment sets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachrach, Robert Z. 233 Chapin Lane Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
Moran, John Christopher 14725 Live Oak Lane Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Käck, Jürgen Kahler, Käck, Fiener et Col. Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104509.3 | 02.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | US20000517227 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 517227 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132947 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132947 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
H01L21/67271 (EP,US);
H01L21/00 (KR);
H01L21/67196 (EP,US);
H01L21/67727 (EP,US);
H01L21/67775 (EP,US);
Y10S414/139 (EP,US);
Y10S414/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/09] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungssystem mit ausziehbaren Vorrichtungen | [2001/37] | English: | Fabrication system with extensible equipment sets | [2001/37] | French: | Système de fabrication avec des équipements extensibles | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.02.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0756316 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 20 * * column 3 - column 4 *; | [X]WO9918603 (APPLIED KOMATSU TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 4 - page 5 *; | [DA]WO9938200 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [DA] 1,10 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9846503 (ASYST TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [DA] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - BRAIN M ET AL, "EMERGING NEEDS FOR CONTINUOUS FLOW FOUP TRANSPORT", 24TH. IEEE/CPMT INTERNATIONAL ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY SYMPOSIUM. (IEMT). AUSTIN, TX, OCT. 18 - 19, 1999, IEEE/CPMT INTERNATIONAL ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY (IEMT) SYMPOSIUM, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19991018), ISBN 0-7803-5503-2, pages 76 - 82, XP000883699 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * |