EP1130919 - Apparatus and method for digital data transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terayon Communication Systems, Inc. 2952 Bunker Hill Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rakib, Selim Shlomo, Dr. 10271 West Acres Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
Azenkot, Yehuda 1128 Littleoak Circle San Jose, California 95129 / US | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01104541.6 | 25.07.1996 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US19950519630 | 25.08.1995 Original published format: US 519630 | US19960588650 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: US 588650 | US19960684243 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: US 684243 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130919 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130919 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04L12/28, H04J11/00, H04J13/02, H04J3/06, H04B1/707, H04L5/02, H04L27/38 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
H04H20/46 (EP,US);
H04B7/204 (KR);
H03M13/256 (EP,US);
H03M13/41 (EP,US);
H03M13/4169 (EP,US);
H03M13/6343 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B7/2668 (EP,US);
H04H20/78 (EP,US);
H04H60/97 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04J13/0022 (EP,US);
H04J13/004 (EP,US);
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04L12/2801 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/362 (EP,US);
H04L27/3872 (EP);
H04L5/0016 (EP,US);
H04L5/06 (EP,US);
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H04N21/2385 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04N7/17309 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04B2201/709709 (EP,US);
H04J14/007 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04W28/24 (EP,US);
H04W28/26 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04W74/0866 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2003/01] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur digitalen Datenübertragung | [2001/36] | English: | Apparatus and method for digital data transmission | [2001/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de transmission de données numériques | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 17.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, GR | 11.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/47] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96927270.7 / EP0858695 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2001 | 05.03.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2001 | 05.03.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2001 | 31.07.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5229996 (BAECKSTROEM TOMAS [SE], et al) [A] 41-55* column A *; | [A] - JOHANSSON A -L ET AL, "SUCCESSIVE INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION IN MULTIPLE DATA RATE DS/CDMA SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19950725), vol. CONF. 45, ISBN 0-7803-2743-8, pages 704 - 708, XP000551625 [A] 1-40 * abstract * * parts I, II and III * | [A] - AKIHIRO KAJIWARA ET AL, "SPREAD SPECTRUM DEMODULATOR USING BLOCK SIGNAL PROCESSING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19910623), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0006-8, pages 894 - 898, XP000269616 [A] 1-40 * column A * * parts 1. and 2. * | [A] - NEE VAN R D J, "TIMING ASPECTS OF SYNCHRONOUS CDMA", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, (1994), pages 439 - 443, XP000619815 [A] 41-55 * page 439 - page 440 * | [A] - KAZAMA H ET AL, "SEMI-AUTONOMOUS SYNCHRONIZATION AMONG BASE STATIONS FOR TDMA-TDD COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19940701), vol. E77-B, no. 7, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 862 - 866, XP000471316 [A] 41-55 * page 862 - page 864, column 2, line 4 * |