EP1155997 - Device for detecting and controlling the height of a stack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states NexPress Solutions LLC 901 Elmgrove Road Rochester, New York 14653-5007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobrindt, Dirk Reiherbruch 7 24147 Klausdorf/Schwentine / DE | 02 /
Goldbeck, Uwe Holtenauer Str. 124 24105 Kiel / DE | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/29] | Lauerwald, Jörg, et al c/o NexPress GmbH Am Kiel-Kanal 2 24106 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Lauerwald, Jörg, et al NexPress GmbH Postfach 24 60 24023 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | Weber, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Handschuhsheimer Landstrasse 2a 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01104788.3 | 27.02.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | DE2000123807 | 15.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023807 | [2001/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1155997 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1155997 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155997 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/10 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B65H31/10 (EP,US);
B65H2511/15 (EP,US);
B65H2553/41 (EP,US);
B65H2801/21 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/15, B65H2220/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/40] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Stapelhöhenerfassung und Stapelhöhensteuerung | [2001/47] | English: | Device for detecting and controlling the height of a stack | [2001/47] | French: | Dispositif pour la détection et le contrôle de la hauteur d'une pile | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | FR | 28.06.2006 | GB | 28.06.2006 | IE | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | AT | 27.02.2007 | LU | 27.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
FR | 28.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 27.02.2007 | ||
LU | 27.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
FR | 28.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 27.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 27.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1812018 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE2310639 (IBM) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1,3-8 * [Y] 3; | [A]EP0798246 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5* column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 44; figures 1-3,5 *; | [Y]DE19711406 (JAGENBERG PAPIERTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 48 - line 68; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0949170 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 3 - line 19; figure 2 * |