EP1239542 - Multilayered slot-coupled antenna device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Communications GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 71522 Backnang / DE | [2006/23] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Marconi Communications GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 71522 Backnang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munk, Marco Esslinger Strasse 47 73773 Aichwald / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Collier, Ian Terry Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Collier, Ian Terry Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon, Essex SS14 3BA / GB | ||
Former [2002/37] | Webb, Peter Reginald Marconi Intellectual Property Marrable House The Vineyards Gt. Baddow Chelmsford Essex CM2 7QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01105286.7 | 05.03.2001 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239542 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239542 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0435 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Schlitz-gekoppelte Antennenanordnung auf einem Mehrschicht-Substrat | [2002/37] | English: | Multilayered slot-coupled antenna device | [2002/37] | French: | Dispositif d'antennes à fentes multicouches | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | BE | 07.06.2006 | CH | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | IE | 05.03.2007 | LU | 05.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
LU | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2666691 (CT REG INNOVAT TRANSFERT TECH [FR], et al) [X] 1,6-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 24 * * page 4, lines 4-12 *; | [X]US5355143 (ZUERCHER JEAN F [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * abstract ** column 3, lines 20-38 *; | [X]US5844523 (BRENNAN JOAN V [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 15, line 52 - column 16, line 6 * |