28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
28.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
19.05.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
27.05.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
15.04.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.04.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.03.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
24.03.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.11.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
01.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
24.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
05.03.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
05.03.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
21.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |