EP1136428 - Lifting device for a lift-truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bavendiek, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Hohler Weg 13 21465 Wentorf / DE | 02 /
Arand, Patrick, Dipl.-Ing Haselknick 22a 22397 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Tödter, Joachim, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Tremsbütteler Weg 49a 22941 Bargteheide / DE | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105373.3 | 09.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | DE2000113077 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10013077 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1136428 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1136428 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136428 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/08, B66F7/18 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B66F9/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/39] | B66F9/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/02] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hubvorrichtung für ein Flurförderzeug | [2001/39] | English: | Lifting device for a lift-truck | [2001/39] | French: | Dispositif de levage pour un chariot élévateur | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.07.2005 | GB | 13.07.2005 | IT | 13.07.2005 | SE | 13.10.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/36] | GB | 13.07.2005 | |
IT | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | GB | 13.07.2005 | |
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | SE | 13.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1010012 (MIAG MUEHLENBAU & IND GMBH) [A] 1,4,7,8* the whole document *; | [A]US3344890 (JAKOB LOEF) [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * column 2, line 39 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2642059 (IPR PRODUCTIQUE SARL [FR]) [A] 1,2,8 * abstract *; | [A]NL1007308C (CANGARU FORKLIFT B V [NL]) [A] 1,4,7,8 * figure - * |