EP1104697 - Ink jet recording head and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasukawa, Shinji Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Usui, Minoru Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Naka, Takahiro Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Kitahara, Tsuyoshi Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 05 /
Okazawa, Noriaki Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 06 /
Sonehara, Hideaki Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105378.2 | 05.09.1996 | [2001/23] | Priority number, date | JP19950251787 | 05.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25178795 | JP19950269191 | 22.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26919195 | JP19950260587 | 06.10.1995 Original published format: JP 26058795 | JP19950306622 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: JP 30662295 | JP19960170605 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: JP 17060596 | [2001/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1104697 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1104697 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104697 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/14274 (EP,US);
B41J2/1612 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1634 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14387 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14419 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/23] | B41J2/16, B41J2/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/23] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichunugskopf und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/23] | English: | Ink jet recording head and method of producing the same | [2001/23] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/23] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 22.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96114233.8 / EP0761447 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH042790 ; | [A]EP0573055 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0652108 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [DA]JPH07166374 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [DA] 1-3 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920410), vol. 016, no. 144, Database accession no. (C - 0927), & JP04002790 A 19920107 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * |