EP1136564 - Reagent for glutamic-pyruvic transaminase assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Higashi Gonome Fukushima-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Higashi Gonome Fukushima-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yoshiro 1-8-18, Showa Koriyama-shi, Fukushima / JP | 02 /
Satokawa, Chie 13-4-203, Mizuosawa, Fukuhara, Fukuyamamachi Koriyama-shi, Fukushima / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Ryo 3-8-4, Midorigaokanishi Koriyama-shi, Fukushima / JP | 04 /
Katayama, Katsuhiro 80-21, Aza Daijuuchi, Tomitamachi Koriyama-shi, Fukushima / JP | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105408.7 | 12.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | JP20000078432 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000078432 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1136564 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1136564 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136564 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/52, C12Q1/32 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/32 (EP,US);
C12Q1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/42] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reagens für Glutamat-pyruvat-transaminase-assay | [2001/39] | English: | Reagent for glutamic-pyruvic transaminase assay | [2001/39] | French: | Réactif pour l'essai de transaminase glutamique pyruvique | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4235962 (SANDERSON JAMES S [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 21 - line 41 * * column 3, line 5 - line 11; examples 1,3 *; | [A]US3458403 (KATSUNUMA NOBUHIKO) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4575488 (KROUWER JAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0009222 (AMERICAN MONITOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [AD] - IFCC SCIENTIFIC COMMITTEE: EXPERT PANEL ON ENZYMES, "IFCC methods for the measurement of catalytic concentrations of enzymes", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1980), vol. 105, pages 147F - 157F, XP009021545 [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(80)90105-9 |