Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1160700
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.01.2007 |
Refusal of application |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
03.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
03.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
17.06.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
12.11.2004 |
First examination report |
|
05.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.10.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
23.04.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
01.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
26.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.10.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |