Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1160700 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2004 | A3 | EP1160700 | 05.12.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10023359 | 12.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10023359 | 22.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10023359 | 12.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002046150 | 18.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10023359 | 12.05.2000 |