EP1143117 - valve characteristic control apparatus of internal combustion engine and methods of controlling valve characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikame, Kazuhisa c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105781.7 | 08.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000065449 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000065449 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143117 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143117 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
F02D13/0207 (EP,US);
F02D13/02 (KR);
F01L1/34406 (EP,US);
F01L1/3442 (EP,US);
F01L13/0042 (EP,US);
F02D13/0226 (EP,US);
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
F01L1/024 (EP,US);
F01L2001/0537 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34469 (EP,US);
F01L2800/00 (EP,US);
F01L2800/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/40] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ventilhub- und Phasenänderungsvorrichtung einer Brennkraftmaschine und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Hubs und der Phase | [2001/41] | English: | valve characteristic control apparatus of internal combustion engine and methods of controlling valve characteristics | [2001/41] | French: | Dispositif pour varier la phase et la course d'une soupape d'un moteur à combustion et méthode pour controller la phase et la course | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/08] | Divisional application(s) | EP04017849.3 / EP1486646 | Request for further processing for: | 03.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06323115 ; | [A]JPH08232617 ; | [A]DE3536742 (BARBOSA DAVID A S [PT]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5529034 (SONE SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5537961 (SHIGERU SONE [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0843080 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0937865 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0942153 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US6006707 (ITO TOKIJI [JP]) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06323115 A 19941122 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08232617 A 19960910 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH08177434 |