EP1134055 - Machine for working profiled elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emmegi S.A. Luxembourg, Lugano Branch Via Pioda, 9 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Emmegi S.A. Luxembourg Lugano Baranch Via Pioda, 9 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Emmergi S.A., Luxembourg, Lugano Branch Via Pioda, 9 6900 Lugano / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellucci, Marco Via Mario Bonacini, 82 41100 Modena / IT | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Luppi, Luigi Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41100 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Luppi, Luigi Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 01105824.5 | 08.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | CH20000045900 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: CH 459002000 | [2001/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134055 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/01, B23Q39/02 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
B23Q39/026 (EP);
B23Q1/012 (EP);
B23Q2240/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine zur Bearbeitung von Profilen | [2001/38] | English: | Machine for working profiled elements | [2001/38] | French: | Machine-outil pour usiner des éléments profilés | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2347366 (SCHIESS AG) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 8 * * figure - *; | [X]FR2348778 (ABBAYE ATEL CONST [FR]) [X] 1-4,9 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 8; figure - *; | [X]FR2473925 (LINE SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,9* page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 5; figure - *; | [XA]US5524328 (HARDESTY MICHAEL P [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 43; figure 1 * [A] 5 |