EP1134276 - Lubricant compositions based on PTFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Via Turati 12 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/17] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states AGORA' S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Ausimont S.p.A. Piazzetta Maurilio Bossi 3 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenti, Daria Via Mazzini 59 15048 Valenza Po, Alessandria / IT | 02 /
Carignano, Gabrielle Via XXV Aprile 15/A 20020 Arese, Milano / IT | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay (Société Anonyme) Intellectual Property Department Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01105921.9 | 09.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI00505 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: IT MI000505 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134276 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C10M173/00, B29C33/62, C08J3/03, C08L27/12, // (C10M173/00, 107:38, 145:36, 147:02, 147:04, 147:04) | [2001/38] | CPC: |
C08J3/03 (EP,US);
B29C33/62 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
C10M107/38 (EP,US);
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
C08J2371/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0606 (EP,US);
C10M2213/062 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/18, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen auf Basis von PTFE | [2001/38] | English: | Lubricant compositions based on PTFE | [2001/38] | French: | Compositions lubrifiantes à base de PTFE | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 20.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05156029 ; | [X]EP0866114 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 20 * page 5, lines 39-51; examples 6-11; claims 1,13 *; | [AD]EP0894838 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-20 * page 2, lines 35-56; examples 16-18; claims 1,9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931005), vol. 017, no. 551, Database accession no. (C - 1117), & JP05156029 A 19930622 (NIPPON SAAFUAKUTANTO KOGYO KK) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 29, Database accession no. 1993-232445, XP002170363 & JPH05156029 A 19930622 (NIPPON SURFACTANT KOGYO KK) [X] 1-20 * abstract * |