EP1238956 - Composite material and method of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 13 38 D-79704 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aechtner, Stefan Margaretenweg 15 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 02 /
Hornberger, Helga Bühlweg 7 79730 Murg-Hänner / DE | 03 /
Nagel, Emil Rüttmattstrasse 13 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 04 /
Thiel, Norbert Schweizerblick 25 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105991.2 | 10.03.2001 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238956 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, C04B38/06, C04B41/83, A61K6/06, A61K6/083 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
A61K6/20 (EP,US);
A61K6/853 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00836 (EP,US);
C04B2201/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12007 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249955 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249958 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/20, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/90, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
C04B38/00, C04B20/008, C04B35/18, C04B41/52 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B33/24 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/119 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/443 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/0072, C04B41/483 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/22] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2002/37] | English: | Composite material and method of making it | [2002/37] | French: | Materiau composite et son procédé de fabrication | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]EP0701808 (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [XD] 19-21,23 * column 1, line 1 - line 12; figures 2,4; claims 1-6,17-23 * * column 6, line 33 - line 56 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 14 * * column 10, line 53 - column 12, line 24 * [A] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11-15,17,18; | [XDA]EP0803241 (G C DENTAL PRODUCTS CORP [JP]) [XD] 17-20 * page 3, line 50 - page 6, line 47; figure 1; examples 1-9; claims 1-9; tables 1,2,4 * [A] 7; | [AD]EP1006095 (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [AD] 7 * column 1, line 1 - line 10; claims 1,4,7-9,19,20,26 * * column 2, line 53 - line 55 * * column 5, line 16 - line 21 ** column 9, line 11 - line 13 * |