EP1132548 - Post footing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heboss Holzbautechnik GbmH Friedbergstrasse 9240 Uzwil / CH | [2001/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherrer, Daniel Nord 971 9122 Ebersol / CH | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Révy von Belvárd, Peter Büchel, von Révy & Partner Zedernpark Bronschhoferstrasse 31 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Révy von Belvárd, Peter Büchel, von Révy & Partner Patentanwälte, Im Zedernpark Bronschhoferstrasse 31 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 01106029.0 | 12.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | CH20000046700 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: CH 467002000 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132548 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132548 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132548 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04H12/22 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
E04H12/2253 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/37] | Extension states | SI | 27.01.2003 | Title | German: | Pfostenfuss | [2001/37] | English: | Post footing | [2001/37] | French: | Pied de poteau | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 01.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.09.2004 | FR | 29.09.2004 | GB | 29.09.2004 | IE | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | TR | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | CY | 12.03.2005 | LU | 12.03.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
IT | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.03.2005 | ||
LU | 12.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.03.2005 | ||
LU | 12.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US930607 (MORRILL EDWIN A [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [A]DE3634266 (NADEL UND DRAHTWARENFABRIK ERN [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 4, line 8 - column 8, line 64; figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE3912064 (CRONENBERG OHG J [DE]) [X] 1,4-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5337989 (APPLE PHILLIP C [US]) [A] 2,3,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4410296 (ABC TEAM SPIELPLATZGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4428028 (KRINNER KLAUS [DE]) [A] 2,3* the whole document * |