EP1154232 - Camera, specifically aerial camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z/I Imaging Ltd. Building 99, Shannon Free Zone Shannon Clare / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Z/I Imaging Ltd. Building 99, Shannon Free Zone Shannon Clare / IE | ||
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Intergraph (Deutschland) GmbH Reichenbachstrasse 3 85737 Ismaning / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Z/I Imaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teuchert, Wolf-Dieter, Dr. Goethestrasse 5 89551 Königsbronn / DE | 02 /
Hinz, Alexander, Dr. Rossruckenstrasse 15 89551 Königsbronn / DE | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Gnatzig, Klaus Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106075.3 | 13.03.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE2000117415 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017415 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154232 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154232 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01C11/02, G03B15/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G01C11/02 (EP);
H04N23/45 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | G01C11/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/20] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kamera, insbesondere Luftbildkamera | [2001/46] | English: | Camera, specifically aerial camera | [2001/46] | French: | Caméra, notamment caméra aérienne | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07294279 ; | [A]US4747155 (DOTSON CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [XAY]US4802757 (PLEITNER PETER K [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 58 - column 4, line 64 * * column 7, line 30 - line 33 * * abstract * [A] 5,6 [Y] 3; | [XDAY]DE3802219 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 11 - line 22 * [A] 5,6,8 [Y] 3; | [XAY]US5371358 (CHANG SHENG-HUEI [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * column 9, line 55 - line 57 * * column 15, line 54 - line 68; figure 17 * [A] 5,6,8 [Y] 3; | [Y]DE19714396 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [Y] 3 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07294279 A 19951110 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |