EP1136928 - Integrated control system for information on machinery and materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Corporation 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Sumitomo Corporation 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarumi, Masayuki 1-23-17-201, Kamikohtohen Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0813 / JP | 02 /
Fuchigami, Toshiyuki 12-4, Murasakinonishifunaoka-cho, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 603-8225 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Minoru 1-13-8-407, Ohike Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0826 / JP | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106125.6 | 13.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | JP20000071229 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000071229 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1136928 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1136928 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Integriertes Steuersystem für Informationen über Maschinen und Materialien | [2001/39] | English: | Integrated control system for information on machinery and materials | [2001/39] | French: | Système de contrôle d'informations sur des machines et des matériaux | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |