EP1143118 - Device for varying the valve lift in an engine cylinder head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rottstegge, Werner Karl-Theodor-Strasse 51 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | 02 /
Wolf, Andreas Schleissheimer Strasse 22 80333 München / DE | 03 /
Meyer, Johannes Hagebuttenweg 9 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 01106205.6 | 14.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | DE2000117441 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017441 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143118 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143118 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143118 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
F01L13/0021 (EP);
F01L13/0063 (EP);
F01L2013/0068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/31] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Hubverstellung eines Gaswechselventils im Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2001/41] | English: | Device for varying the valve lift in an engine cylinder head | [2001/41] | French: | Dispositif pour varier la levée d'une soupape dans la culasse d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/41] | Dispositif pour varier la levée d'une soupape dans la culasse d'un moteurà combustion interne | Examination procedure | 23.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0638706 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, lines 1-6 * * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 5 * * column 7, lines 23-33 * * figures 1,8 *; | [A]DE19708484 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 3-6 * * column 2, lines 4-36 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4223172 | DE4326331 |