EP1134784 - High-pressure mercury lamp luminescent device and means of ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2007/28] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arimoto, Tomoyoshi 196-31, Nishitorii, Kamioka-cho Tatuno-shi, Hyogo-ken, Tatuno / JP | 02 /
Okamoto, Masashi 1-71, Hitomaru-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken, Akashi / JP | 03 /
Takaya, Izumi B208,385-1, Higashiyama Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken, Himeji / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324 80048 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106241.1 | 14.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000075434 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000075434 | JP20000335804 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000335804 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134784 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134784 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134784 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/82, H01J61/52, H01J61/54, H01J61/20, H01J61/56, H01J61/86 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H01J61/822 (EP,US);
H01J61/20 (EP,US);
H01J61/52 (EP,US);
H01J61/54 (EP,US);
H01J61/56 (EP,US);
H05B41/042 (EP,US);
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
H05B41/382 (EP,US);
H01J61/86 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2005/26] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Quecksilberhochdrucklampen-Leuchtvorrichtung und Mittel zu ihrer Zündung | [2001/38] | English: | High-pressure mercury lamp luminescent device and means of ignition | [2001/38] | French: | Dispositif luminescent comportant une lampe à mercure à haute pression et moyens d'allumage | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB573141 (SIEMENS ELECTRIC LAMPS & SUPPL, et al) [Y] 7 * page 1, lines 89,90 * [A] 1,2,10; | [Y]US4658184 (GASPAR JANOS [HU]) [Y] 3-5,8,9 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 26 * * column 5, lines 5-26 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4678958 (CSAPODY MIKLOS [HU]) [A] 1-5,10 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 16 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0258829 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,10 * column 3, lines 19-36 * * column 3, lines 48-54 * * column 4, lines 14-31 * * figure 3 *; | [DY]US5109181 (FISCHER HANNS E [DE], et al) [DY] 1-5,7-10 * column 3, lines 23-25 * * abstract * |