blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1134850

EP1134850 - Adaptor and electrical connector for an adaptor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wieland Electric GmbH
Brennerstrasse 10-14
96052 Bamberg / DE
[2001/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Burger, Michael
Ziegelhütte 7
96196 Trunstadt / DE
 [2001/38]
Representative(s)Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte
Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[2001/38]
Application number, filing date01106290.815.03.2001
[2001/38]
Priority number, dateDE200011334617.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10013346
[2001/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1134850
Date:19.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1134850
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1134850
Date:21.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/518, H01R31/06
[2001/51]
CPC:
H01R13/518 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/38]H01R13/518
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/38]
TitleGerman:Durchführungsadapter und Steckverbinder für einen Durchführungsadapter[2001/38]
English:Adaptor and electrical connector for an adaptor[2001/38]
French:Adaptateur et connecteur pour un adaptateur[2001/38]
Examination procedure22.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
08.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2003Fee for grant paid
08.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
PT21.12.2004
CY15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2009/42]
Former [2008/03]IE21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
PT21.12.2004
CY15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/26]IE21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
CY15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/20]IE21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
CY15.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/09]IE21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]IE21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/24]IE21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
Former [2005/18]GR21.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH02273476  ;
 [AD]DE19826453  (WIELAND ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 14; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910129), vol. 015, no. 036, Database accession no. (E - 1027), & JP02273476 A 19901107 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.