EP1114644 - Composition comprising NPH insulin (neutral protamine hagedorn insulin) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Ross, G. 25 Glen Road Devonport, Auckland 9 / NZ | 02 /
OESWEIN, James, Q. 514 Sierra Street, PO Box 13 Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | 03 /
YEUNG, Douglas, A. 2628 Benchark Avenue Fremont, CA 94536 / US | [2002/29] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
CLARK, Ross, G. 25 Glen Road Devonport, Auckland 9 / NZ | ||
02 /
OESEIN, James, Q. 514 Sierra Street, PO Box 13 Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | |||
03 /
YEUNG, Douglas, A. 2628 Benchark Avenue Fremont, CA 94536 / US | |||
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
CLARK, Ross, G. 25 Glen Road Devonport, Auckland 9 / NZ | ||
02 /
OESEIN, James, Q. 123 Madrone Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94018 / US | |||
03 /
YEUNG, Douglas, A. 2628 Benchark Avenue Fremont, CA 94536 / US | |||
Former [2001/28] | 01 /
CLARK, Ross, G. 711 Ursula Avenue Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | ||
02 /
OESEIN, James, Q. 123 Madrone Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94018 / US | |||
03 /
YEUNG, Douglas, A. 2628 Benchark Avenue Fremont, CA 94536 / US | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/28] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106315.3 | 31.07.1997 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | US19960696314 | 13.08.1996 Original published format: US 696314 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114644 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114644 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/28, A61P3/10 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K38/30 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/30, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/28] | A61K38/30, // (A61K38/30, 38:28) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/33] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 15.03.2001 | LT | 15.03.2001 | LV | 15.03.2001 | RO | 15.03.2001 | SI | 15.03.2001 | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung die NPH-Insulin (Neutral-protamin Hagedorn Insulin) enthält | [2001/28] | English: | Composition comprising NPH insulin (neutral protamine hagedorn insulin) | [2001/28] | French: | Composition comportant NPH insuline (insuline protamine neutre de Hagedorn) | [2002/05] |
Former [2001/28] | Composition comportant NPH insuline (neutre protamine insuline de Hagedorn) | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 04.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97935259.8 / EP0918536 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0331630 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 6 * abstract * * page 2, lines 40-65 - page 3, lines 10-30; example 2; claims 1,4,5,7,10 * * claims 19-21 *; | [X]EP0561330 (LIEDTKE PHARMED GMBH [DE]) [X] 6 * abstract * * column 8 *; | [X]WO9601125 (PHARMACIA AB [SE], et al) [X] 6 * abstract *; | [X]WO9602270 (GROPEP PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 6 * abstract * * page 7, lines 18-31; example 1; claims 1,3,4 * * claim 16 *; | [E]WO9934822 (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [E] 1-6 * abstract ** page 24; examples 3,4 *; | [E]WO0023098 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [E] 1-6 * table 3 *; | [E]WO0061177 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [E] 1-6 * example 1 *; | [E]WO0100223 (MINIMED INC [US]) [E] 6 * abstract *; | [X] - QUATTRIN T. ET AL, "Dual hormonal replacement with insulin and recombinant human insulin- like growth factor I in IDDM: Effects on glycemic control, IGF-I levels, and safety profile", DIABETES CARE, 1997, 20/3 (374-380), USA, XP002045791 [X] 6 * abstract * * page 375, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 376, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 377, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [X] - JABRI N. ET AL, "Adverse effects of recombinant human insulin-like growth factor I in obese insulin-resistant type II diabetic patients", DIABETES, 1994, 43/3 (369-374), USA, XP002045793 [X] 6 * abstract * * page 370, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 370, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.43.3.369 |