EP1136287 - Self-powered bead lifting lever [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING SPA Via Dell'Ecologia, 6 42047 Rolo, Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING SPA Via Balduina, 5/7 42010 Rio Saliceto (Reggio Emilia) / IT | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING S.r.l. Via Balduina, 5/7 42010 Rio Saliceto (Reggio Emilia) / IT | ||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING S.r.l. Via Balduina, 5/7 I-42010 Rio Saliceto (Prov. of Reggio Emilia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzaga, Tullio Via Canolo 41 42015 Correggio (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2003/44] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano c/o Dr.Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Via D. Manin, 5 37122 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2001/49] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Reniero, Bergamini & Partners s.r.l., 21, Via A. Sciesa 37122 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2001/39] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano ALBA sas, Via A. Sciesa, 21 37122 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 01106376.5 | 19.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | IT2000VR00027 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: IT VR000027 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1136287 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1136287 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136287 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C25/02 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B60C25/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/39] | Title | German: | Selbstangetriebener Reifenwulstkern- Hebel | [2001/39] | English: | Self-powered bead lifting lever | [2001/39] | French: | Levier automoteur de levage du talon | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BE | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | CY | 19.03.2005 | LU | 19.03.2005 | IE | 21.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | GB | 12.04.2005 | SE | 12.04.2005 | ES | 23.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 19.03.2005 | ||
LU | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 21.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 19.03.2005 | ||
LU | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 21.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 21.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
GB | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 12.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA1018054 (MIELKE HENRY J) [Y] 13 * figures 1,5 *; | [Y]FR2574346 (ERNST WILHELM [CH]) [Y] 12,16 * figure - *; | [X]US4995439 (BURGE LEONARD F [AU]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 40; figure - *; | [Y]US5265661 (TRAN LOI V [US]) [Y] 14,15 * figure - *; | [A]US5806578 (GONZAGA TULLIO [IT]) [A] 11* figure 1 *; | [XY]GB2336139 (NORTH LINCS TYRES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 19; figure - * [Y] 12-16 |