EP1142888 - Process for the preparation of Dialcoxythiophenes and Alkylendioxythiophenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauchschwalbe, Günter, Dr. Am Märchen 2 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Jonas, Friedrich, Dr. Krugenofen 15 52066 Aachen / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 01106444.1 | 23.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | DE2000116723 | 04.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10016723 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142888 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142888 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/32 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D495/06 (KR);
C07D333/32 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dialkoxythiophenen und Alkylendioxythiophenen | [2001/41] | English: | Process for the preparation of Dialcoxythiophenes and Alkylendioxythiophenes | [2001/41] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de dialcoxy thiophène et alcoylèndioxy thiophène | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.09.2004 | IE | 08.09.2004 | TR | 08.09.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | CY | 23.03.2005 | LU | 23.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CY | 23.03.2005 | ||
LU | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CY | 23.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
TR | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 08.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2453103 (TURNBULL JR STOCKTON GRAEME) [YD] 1-8 * column W *; | [Y]WO9524373 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column W *; | [YD] - MERZ,A. ET AL., "IMPROVED PREPARATION OF 3,4-DIMETHOXYTHIOPHENE", J.PRAKT.CHEM, LEIPZIG, (1996), vol. 338, pages 672 - 674, XP001000173 [YD] 1-8 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prac.199633801128 | [YD] - HEYWANG G ET AL, "POLY(ALKYLENEDIOXYTHIOPHENE)S-NEW, VERY STABLE CONDUCTING POLYMERS**", ADVANCED MATERIALS,DE,VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, WEINHEIM, (19920201), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 116 - 118, XP000306687 [YD] 1-8 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.19920040213 | [YD] - OVERBERGER,C.G. ET AL., "The Prparation of 3,4-Dimethoxy-2,5-dicarbethoxythiphene. 3,4-Dimethoxythiphene.", J.AM.CHEM.SOC., WASHINGTON, (1951), vol. 73, pages 2956 - 2957, XP001005623 [YD] 1-8 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01150a525 | [YD] - COFFEY, M. ET AL., "A facile sytnesis of 3,4-dialkyoxthiphenes", SYNTHETIC COMMUN., NEW YORK, (1996), vol. 26, no. 11, pages 2205 - 2212, XP001005513 [YD] 1-8 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919608003580 |