EP1154131 - Exhaust gas purifying device for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Hiroshima / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Motoshi c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Waranabe, Tomomi c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Hayashibara, Hiroshi c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 04 /
Takami, Akihide c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 05 /
Kobayashi, Akihiro c/o Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106515.8 | 14.03.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | JP20000074747 | 16.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000074747 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154131 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154131 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154131 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N11/00, F02D41/02, F02D41/40 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
F02D41/025 (EP);
F01N11/002 (EP);
F01N13/0097 (EP);
F02D41/405 (EP);
F01N2550/02 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | F01N11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/34] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reinigung des Abgases einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2001/46] | English: | Exhaust gas purifying device for internal combustion engine | [2001/46] | French: | Dispositif de purification des gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 27.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FR, GB, IT | 11.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0460106 ; | [DA]US5133184 (GEIGER ISTVAN [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0947683 (HERAEUS ELECTRO NITE INT [BE]) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP0952320 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019]; figure 1 * [A] 3,4,6; | [PY]EP1052385 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PY] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920609), vol. 016, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 1263), & JP04060106 A 19920226 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | by applicant | US5133184 |