EP1136111 - Twist and lock filter housing with anti-rotation stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLEETGUARD, INC. 2931 Elm Hill Pike Nashville Tennessee 37214 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Fleetguard, Inc. 2931 Elm Hill Pike Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states NELSON INDUSTRIES, INC. 1801 Highway 51 Stoughton, Wisconsin 53589 / US | ||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states NELSON INDUSTRIES, INC. 1801 Highway 51 West Stoughton, Wisconsin 53589-0600 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wake, Jon S. 498 Linden Street Verona, Wisconsin 53593 / US | 02 /
Mikolichek, Michael J. 413 4th Street NE Mayer, Wisconsin 55360 / US | 03 /
Stiemke, Donald E. 1213 Gilson Street, Apt. No. 1 Madison, Wisconsin 53715 / US | 04 /
Holzmann, Mark V. 200 North Lynn Street Stoughton, Wisconsin 53589 / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2001/39] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01106907.7 | 20.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | US20000533006 | 22.03.2000 Original published format: US 533006 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136111 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136111 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/30 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B01D46/0004 (EP,US);
B01D35/30 (EP,US);
B01D2201/301 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4076 (EP,US);
B01D2265/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Filtergehäuse mit Drehverriegelung und Sicherung gegen Lösen | [2001/39] | English: | Twist and lock filter housing with anti-rotation stop | [2001/39] | French: | Boîtier à filtre avec système de fermeture "twist and lock" et dispositif de blocage anti-rotation | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 27.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 27.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.04.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.12.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09173717 ; | [X]US4215790 (RIBBLE FRANKLIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 9 * * column 4, line 10 - line 48; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US4331247 (MUMFORD GEORGE V) [A] * abstract *; | [A]GB2138411 (AUDUS NOBLE LTD) [A] * abstract *; | [A]FR2712506 (LABINAL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 14 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 4; figures 3,7-9 *; | [A]WO9840147 (ALAMO WATER REFINERS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 38; figures 3,4 *; | [E]EP1093839 (FILTRAUTO [FR]) [E] 1-3 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 35 * * column 6, line 19 - line 27; figures 1-9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09173717 A 19970708 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |