Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50102453D1 | 08.07.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50102453 | 22.03.2001 | DE10016824 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1142467 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2004 | B1 | EP1142467 | 10.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10016824 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE268105T | 15.06.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10016824 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10016824 | 11.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10016824 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0101406 | 28.01.2003 | A3 | HUP0101406 | 29.05.2002 | A2 | HU0101406D0 | 28.06.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE10016824 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL346828 | 08.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10016824 | 06.04.2000 |