EP1142467 - Device for picking stem crops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Saulgau GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 2 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | [2004/23] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH Zeppelinstrasse 2 88348 Saulgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albinger, Bernd Stauferstrasse 9 88454 Hochdorf / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 01107119.8 | 22.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | DE2000116824 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10016824 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142467 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142467 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01D45/02 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A01D41/144 (EP);
A01D45/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Pflücken der Fruchtstände stängeliger Erntegüter | [2001/41] | English: | Device for picking stem crops | [2001/41] | French: | Dispositif de cueillette de céréales | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.06.2004 | FR | 02.06.2004 | GB | 02.06.2004 | IE | 02.06.2004 | IT | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | TR | 02.06.2004 | DK | 02.09.2004 | GR | 02.09.2004 | SE | 02.09.2004 | ES | 13.09.2004 | PT | 02.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
FR | 02.06.2004 | ||
GB | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
IT | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
TR | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
FR | 02.06.2004 | ||
GB | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
TR | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
FR | 02.06.2004 | ||
GB | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
GB | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
GB | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 02.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4446682 (JENNEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [DA]EP0131853 (GERINGHOFF CARL GMBH CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,8 * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 29 * * page 14, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US4538404 (HEIMARK JR CHARLES J [US], et al); | [A]DE8535733U (GERINGHOFF); | [A]EP0491405 (CAPELLO R & F FLLI [IT]); | [A]EP0534199 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0750833 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP0131853 | EP0534199 |