14.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] |
05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
12.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
13.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
08.09.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
01.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
18.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
28.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
14.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
02.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
05.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
16.09.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
13.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.04.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.11.2003 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.09.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.05.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
03.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
31.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] |