EP1239452 - Support for a musical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilfer, Hans-Peter Zum Hackerhof 5 08258 Markneukirchen / DE | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Zech, Stefan Markus Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Meissner, Bolte & Partner Karolinenstrasse 27 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107148.7 | 22.03.2001 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001203849U | 06.03.2001 Original published format: DE 20103849 U | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239452 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239452 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10G5/00 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G10G5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Ständer für ein Musikinstrument | [2002/37] | English: | Support for a musical instrument | [2002/37] | French: | Support pour un instrument de musique | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6036159 (YU MING-TI [TW]) [X] 1-4,7-14 * abstract * [Y] 5; | [Y]FR2582846 (BARATAY CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [A]US4345732 (GALLEGOS MANUEL) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [X]US5029796 (SCHOENIG DARRELL A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6127612 (YU MING-TI [TW]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5836552 (YU MING-TI [TW]) [X] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A]US5363734 (WILENKEN STEPHEN P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US5375497 (PIRCHIO PAOLO [IT], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract * |