EP1137078 - Piezoelectric element and manufacturing method and manufacturing device thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murai, Masami Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107204.8 | 22.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | JP20000083970 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000083970 | JP20000173609 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000173609 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1137078 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1137078 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09, H01L41/24, B41J2/14 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2/161 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1645 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
H10N30/078 (EP,US);
H10N30/079 (EP,US);
H10N30/2047 (EP,US);
H10N30/877 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/39] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrisches Bauelement und Verfahren sowie Gerät zur Herstellung desselben | [2001/39] | English: | Piezoelectric element and manufacturing method and manufacturing device thereof | [2001/39] | French: | Elément piézo-électrique et méthode et appareil de sa fabrication | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/35] | Divisional application(s) | EP06004659.6 / EP1675193 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08335676 ; | [XA]JPH1098049 ; | [XY]JPH05235268 ; | [XA]US5431561 (YAMABE KIKUO [JP], et al); | [A]US5453294 (OGI KATSUMI [JP], et al); | [XY]US5456945 (MCMILLAN LARRY D [US], et al); | [AY]EP0764992 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A]US5998236 (ROEDER JEFFREY [US], et al); | [PXPY]EP0993953 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) |