EP1157986 - Composition for preparing frothed PVC foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Th. Böhme KG Chem. Fabrik GmbH & Co. Isardamm 79-83 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2001/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostermann, Jürgen Waldstrasse 5 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 02 /
Schinnerl, Heike Karwendelweg 4 82538 Geretsried / DE | 03 /
Hieb, Maria Schlierseeweg 13 82538 Geretsried / DE | 04 /
Schönmann, Gertrud, Dr. Gstaller Weg 3 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 05 /
Ritschel, Susanne Isardamm 89 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Störle, Christian, et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Störle, Christian, Dr., et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107399.6 | 26.03.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | DE2000126234 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026234 | [2001/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157986 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157986 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/31, C08J9/00, // C08L27/06 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
C08J9/30 (EP);
C08J9/0033 (EP);
C08K5/01 (EP);
C08K5/053 (EP);
C08K5/42 (EP);
C08J2327/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/01, C08L27/06 (EP);
C08K5/053, C08L27/06 (EP);
C08K5/42, C08L27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Extension states | SI | 06.12.2001 | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Herstellung von PVC-Schlagschäumen | [2001/48] | English: | Composition for preparing frothed PVC foams | [2001/48] | French: | Composition pour la préparation de mousses fouettées de PVC | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2003 | FI | 21.05.2003 | GB | 21.05.2003 | IE | 21.05.2003 | IT | 21.05.2003 | TR | 21.05.2003 | DK | 21.08.2003 | GR | 21.08.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | ES | 01.09.2003 | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
TR | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
TR | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
GB | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 21.08.2003 | |
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 21.08.2003 | |
PT | 21.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61130350 ; | [A]DE2848672 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0040055 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1* claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861031), vol. 010, no. 321, Database accession no. (C - 382), & JP61130350 A 19860618 (NIPPON ZEON CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |