EP1143611 - Digital automatic gain control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazakevich, Leonid 95 Roundtree Drive Plainview, NY 11803 / US | 02 /
Ozluturk, Fatih 70 Willowdale Avenue Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107436.6 | 27.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000192289P | 27.03.2000 Original published format: US 192289 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143611 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143611 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H03G7/001 (EP,US);
H03G3/3052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Digitale automatische Verstärkungsregelung | [2001/41] | English: | Digital automatic gain control | [2001/41] | French: | Circuit digitale automatique de gain | [2005/10] |
Former [2001/41] | CIRCUIT DIGITALE AUTOMATIQUE DE GAIN | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2005 | BE | 13.07.2005 | CH | 13.07.2005 | CY | 13.07.2005 | LI | 13.07.2005 | TR | 13.07.2005 | GR | 13.10.2005 | PT | 19.12.2005 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CH | 13.07.2005 | ||
LI | 13.07.2005 | ||
TR | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CH | 13.07.2005 | ||
LI | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
BE | 13.07.2005 | ||
CH | 13.07.2005 | ||
LI | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
CH | 13.07.2005 | ||
LI | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5533064 (ICHIHARA MASAKI [JP]) [Y] 2,3* abstract *; | [XAY]US5852772 (LAMPE ROSS W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 32; figure 4 * [A] 6 [Y] 2,3 |