EP1119043 - BiCDMOS process technology and structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2013/25] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road Santa Clara California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yilmaz, Hamza 18549 Paseo Peublo Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 02 /
Cornell, Michael E. 1576 Summerfield Drive Campbell, California 95008 / US | 03 /
Williams, Richard K. 10292 Norwick Avenue Cupertino, California 95008 / US | 04 /
Chen, Jue Wei 19725 Braemar Drive Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [2001/41] |
Former [2001/30] | 01 /
Yilmaz, Hamza 18549 Paseo Peublo Saratoga, California 95070 / US | ||
02 /
Cornell, Michael E. 663 Regas Drive Campbell, California 95008 / US | |||
03 /
Williams, Richard K. 10292 Norwick Avenue Cupertino, California 95008 / US | |||
04 /
Chen, Jue Wei 19725 Braemar Drive Saratoga, California 95070 / US | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01107550.4 | 21.09.1993 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | US19920948276 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: US 948276 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1119043 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1119043 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119043 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8249, H01L27/06, H01L29/10, H01L29/732, H01L29/66, H01L29/78 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H01L29/7816 (EP,US);
H01L21/8249 (EP,US);
H01L27/0635 (EP,US);
H01L29/1004 (EP,US);
H01L29/66272 (EP,US);
H01L29/7322 (EP,US);
H01L29/7801 (US);
H01L29/7809 (EP,US);
H01L29/7835 (EP,US);
H01L29/0638 (EP,US);
H01L29/0847 (EP,US);
H01L29/0878 (EP,US);
H01L29/42368 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S148/009 (EP,US);
Y10S148/085 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | H01L21/8249, H01L27/06, H01L29/78 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [2001/30] | Title | German: | BiCDMOS-Prozess-Technologie und deren Strukturen | [2001/30] | English: | BiCDMOS process technology and structures | [2001/30] | French: | Technologie de fabrication BiCDMOS et ses structures | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93307457.7 / EP0589675 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19930307457) is 14.10.1996 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Request for further processing for: | 31.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 22.09.2013 | [2014/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0230187 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * figure 4 *; | [X]US4922327 (MENA JOSE G [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US4887142 (BERTOTTI FRANCO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,6-8 * figure 12 * [Y] 9; | [X]JPH03203377 ; | [Y]EP0401135 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 38 - line 43; figure 12 *; | [A]US4344080 (TIHANYI JENOE) [A] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0477995 (FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR [US]) [A] 9 * figure 16 *; | [A]EP0500233 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 9 * figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP0514060 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [PA] 1,2 * figures 1-3,5-7,9,10,12 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911128), vol. 015, no. 470, Database accession no. (E - 1139), & JP03203377 A 19910905 (NEC CORP) [X] 4,5 * abstract * |